Magistrate Judge Peck is so Designated. (bm) (Entered: 06/02/1998)
1998-07-14
2
NOTICE OF MOTION by U.S. Treasury Dept., I.R.S., Steven D. Geary, Charles A. Barg, Walter D. Duvall, Richard Sherwood, Keith Kuhn, Steven D. Raisch, Frank Hardesty, Harry Patsalides, Thomas Jack, Jane Doe to dismiss the complaint as to the FRCP purs to Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP . Return date 8/14/98 @12:30. (lam) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
1998-07-14
3
MEMORANDUM by the Federal defts U.S. Treasury Dept., I.R.S., Steven D. Geary, Charles A. Barg, Walter D. Duvall, Richard Sherwood, Keith Kuhn, Steven D. Raisch, Frank Hardesty, Harry Patsalides, Thomas Jack, Jane Doe in support of [2-1] motion to dismiss the complaint as to the FRCP purs to Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP (lam) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
1998-09-09
4
Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter from pltff, Alfred W. Goff dated 8/11/98; This discovery is not necessary to oppose a motion to dismiss a pleading and the request is therefore denied ; pltff's Response to defts' motion reset to 9/14/98 for [2-1] motion to dismiss the complaint as to the FRCP purs to Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP (signed by Judge Owen ) (lam) Modified on 09/10/1998 (Entered: 09/10/1998)
1998-09-18
5
REPLY MEMORANDUM by Federal defts U.S. Treasury Dept., I.R.S., Steven D. Geary, Charles A. Barg, Walter D. Duvall, Richard Sherwood, Keith Kuhn, Steven D. Raisch, Frank Hardesty, Harry Patsalides, Thomas Jack, Jane Doe re: in support of their [2-1] motion to dismiss the complaint as to the FRCP purs to Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP (lam) (Entered: 09/23/1998)
1998-09-21
6
Addendum to Motion to Oppose of Amy Benjamin, Esq. 7/29/98 filed by pltff Alfred w. Goff. (lam) (Entered: 09/25/1998)
1998-09-25
7
Affidavit submit by Afred Goff was rejected by Judge Owen for absense of original signature on the document. (Original document was returned by the Pro Se Office) (kw) Modified on 10/14/1998 (Entered: 10/14/1998)
2000-11-01
8
AFFIDAVIT of Alfred W. Goff in opposition to [2-1] motion to dismiss the complaint as to the FRCP purs to 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP. (lam) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
2000-11-01
9
RESPONSE by Alfred W. Goff Re: [5-1] reply memorandum, in support of [2-1] motion to dismiss the complaint as to the FRCP purs to Rules 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP (lam) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
2001-08-06
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; that for the reasons set forth in this Order, defendants' [2-1] motion to dismiss the complaint in its entirety against all named defendants is granted. ( signed by Judge Richard Owen ); Copies mailed. Original document forwarded to Judgment Clerk. (kkc) (Entered: 08/06/2001)
2001-08-08
11
JUDGMENT; it is ordered, adjudged and decreed that for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated 8/1/01, defts' motion to dismiss is granted. ( signed by James M. Parkison, Clerk of Court ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. Entered On Docket: 8/9/01. (sac) (Entered: 08/09/2001)