Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleV.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc. vs Secretary of the Air Force
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CitySan Antonio
Case Number5:2012cv01197
Date Filed2012-12-18
Date Closed2013-08-16
JudgeJudge John W. Primomo
PlaintiffV.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc.
DefendantSecretary of the Air Force
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-12-181COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-5140545), filed by V.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dulske, John) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
2012-12-182REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by V.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc.. (Dulske, John) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
2012-12-18Case Assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tr1) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-18If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge John W. Primomo (tr1) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-193Summons Issued as to Secretary of the Air Force, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dtg) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-314Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Secretary of the Air Force, V.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LoCurto, John) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
2013-01-045ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Secretary of the Air Force answer due 2/20/2013. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
2013-02-206ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Secretary of the Air Force.(LoCurto, John) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
2013-03-057Order and Advisory: Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within 45 days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
2013-04-048CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Secretary of the Air Force. (LoCurto, John) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
2013-04-049CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by V.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc.. (Dulske, John) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
2013-04-0810ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John W. Primomo for all proceedings. Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
2013-04-1611Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Secretary of the Air Force, V.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LoCurto, John) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
2013-04-1812ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order on or before May 20, 2013. Signed by Judge John W. Primomo. (rg) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
2013-04-18Set Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/20/2013. (rg) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
2013-05-2113STATUS REPORT by V.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc.. (Dulske, John) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
2013-07-0214STATUS REPORT by Secretary of the Air Force. (LoCurto, John) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
2013-08-0215STATUS REPORT regarding status of settlement and stipulation of dismissal by Secretary of the Air Force. (LoCurto, John) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
2013-08-1516ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/28/2013 Show Cause Hearing set for 8/29/2013 09:00 AM in Default hearing location for San Antonio before Judge John W. Primomo,. Signed by Judge John W. Primomo. (wg) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
2013-08-1617STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by Secretary of the Air Force, V.K. Knowlton Construction & Utilities, Inc.. (LoCurto, John) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff