Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2012cv02053
Date Filed2012-12-20
Date Closed2013-08-30
JudgeJudge Ellen S. Huvelle
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-12-201COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-3169739) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 7.1 Certificate, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons)(McCall, Ginger) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
2012-12-20Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (mmh) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
2012-12-212ELECTRONIC SUMMONS Issued (3) as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Notice)(mmh) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
2012-12-213LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (McCall, Ginger) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
2013-02-124NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
2013-02-125Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
2013-02-12MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: UPON CONSIDERATION of the consent motion for enlargement filed by defendant, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint on or before March 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 12, 2013. (AG) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
2013-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to Complaint due by 3/18/2013. (gdf) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
2013-03-186Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
2013-03-18MIUNTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: UPON CONSIDERATION of the consent motion for enlargement filed by defendant, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint on or before March 25, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 18, 2013. (AG) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
2013-03-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/25/2013 (gdf) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-03-257Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
2013-03-26MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order: UPON CONSIDERATION of the joint motion for entry of proposed briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due on August 8, 2013; that plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment will be due on September 9, 2013; that defendant's reply will be due on September 24, 2013; and that plaintiff's reply will be due on October 9, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 26, 2013. (AG) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
2013-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 9/9/2013. Reply to Cross Motions due by 10/9/2013. Summary Judgment motions due by 8/8/2013. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/24/2013. (gdf) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
2013-07-318Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Under Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-07-31MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: UPON CONSIDERATION of the joint motion for two week extension of deadlines in briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due on August 22, 2013; that plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgement will be due on September 23, 2013; that defendant's reply will be due on October 8, 2013; and that plaintiff's reply will be due on October 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 31, 2013. (AG) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 8/22/2013. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 9/23/2013. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/8/2013. Plaintiff's Reply to Cross Motions due by 10/23/2013. (cdw) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
2013-08-029ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Ginger P. McCall on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (McCall, Ginger) Modified on 8/6/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
2013-08-0210NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. Attorney Ginger P. McCall terminated. (McCall, Ginger) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
2013-08-06NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 9 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using their assigned login/password. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
2013-08-2311NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
2013-08-2712NOTICE of Settlement by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff