Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleConover v. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2012cv06480
Date Filed2012-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffJeffrey S. Conover
DefendantBoard of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-12-201COMPLAINT, no process, against Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Filed byJeffrey S. Conover. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
2012-12-202MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey S. Conover. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
2012-12-203ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2013 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff