Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-06-01 | 1 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division from Twelfth Judicial District Court, County of Otero, State of New Mexico, case number D-1215-CV-2016-00344. ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/01/2016) |
2016-06-01 | | Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (kdh) (Entered: 06/01/2016) |
2016-06-01 | | Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (kdh) (Entered: 06/01/2016) |
2016-06-01 | 2 | PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 06/01/2016) |
2016-06-08 | 3 | NOTICE by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division of Filing Copies of State Court Records (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8) (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/08/2016) |
2016-06-10 | 4 | MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by Joel Saavedra, U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division. (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/10/2016) |
2016-06-10 | 5 | MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Joel Saavedra, U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division. (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/10/2016) |
2016-06-17 | 6 | Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Writ of Mandamus and/or Declaratory Relief ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions. (Arnold, Rudolph) (Entered: 06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Rudolph Arnold on behalf of State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions (Arnold, Rudolph) (Entered: 06/17/2016) |
2016-06-22 | 8 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Eddie Beagles. (Dotson, David) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-06-22 | 9 | MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Eddie Beagles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Dotson, David) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-06-23 | 10 | NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kdj) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/23/2016) |
2016-06-23 | 12 | PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iam) (Entered: 06/23/2016) |
2016-06-24 | 13 | NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: no. 11. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (hbs) (Entered: 06/24/2016) |
2016-06-30 | 14 | NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Stephen Cummings on behalf of State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions (Cummings, Shawn) (Entered: 06/30/2016) |
2016-07-11 | 15 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Joel Saavedra, U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division. (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/11/2016) |
2016-07-11 | 16 | NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Joel Saavedra, U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Joel Saavedra, U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/11/2016) |
2017-01-17 | 17 | NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Robert Dale Morrison substituted for Rudolph P. Arnold (Morrison, Robert) (Entered: 01/17/2017) |
2017-01-17 | 18 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions. (Morrison, Robert) (Entered: 01/17/2017) |
2017-01-17 | 19 | AFFIDAVIT by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions (Morrison, Robert) (Entered: 01/17/2017) |
2017-01-17 | 20 | MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 19 Affidavit filed by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions. (Morrison, Robert) (Entered: 01/17/2017) |
2017-02-21 | 21 | NOTICE of Briefing Complete by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions (Morrison, Robert) (Entered: 02/21/2017) |
2017-03-01 | 22 | MOTION for Supplement by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions. (Morrison, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2017) |
2017-03-14 | 23 | NOTICE of Briefing Complete by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions re 22 MOTION for Supplement filed by State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions (Morrison, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2017) |
2017-09-06 | 24 | MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting, in part, 4 Defendants Joel Saavedra and the U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division's Motion to Dismiss. (tah) (Entered: 09/06/2017) |
2017-09-06 | 25 | MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 18 New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions' Motion for Summary Judgment. (tah) (Entered: 09/06/2017) |
2017-09-06 | 26 | ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. See 24 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (tah) (Entered: 09/07/2017) |
2017-09-06 | 27 | SUMMARY JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales In favor of Defendant New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions. (tah) (Entered: 09/07/2017) |
2018-08-30 | 28 | ORDER to File Status Report by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Status Report due September 13, 2018. (ag) (Entered: 08/30/2018) |
2018-09-13 | 29 | Joint Status Report by Eddie Beagles (Dotson, David) (Entered: 09/13/2018) |
2018-09-14 | 30 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 09/14/2018) |
2018-09-17 | 31 | ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 9/25/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at (505) 348-2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (ag) (Entered: 09/17/2018) |
2018-09-25 | 32 | Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Status Conference held on 9/25/2018. (ag) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-09-26 | 33 | ORDER setting Briefing Schedule by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-10-18 | 34 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eddie Beagles. (Dotson, David) (Entered: 10/18/2018) |
2018-11-08 | 35 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Defendants Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. FOIA request, # 2 Exhibit 2. Response to request, # 3 Exhibit 3. Follow up request, # 4 Exhibit 4. Response by Defendant, # 5 Exhibit 5. Appeal, # 6 Exhibit 5a. Specific Docments relating to appeal, # 7 Exhibit 6. Reply of reciept of appeal, # 8 Exhibit 7. Responsive documents, # 9 Exhibit 8. Vaughn Index) (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 11/08/2018) |
2018-11-26 | 36 | STIPULATION re 33 Order For Extension of Time to File Reply by Eddie Beagles (Dotson, David) (Entered: 11/26/2018) |
2018-11-27 | 37 | ORDER Granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's Reply is now due to the Court on or before 12/7/2018 . Defendant's Reply is now due to the Court on or before 12/28/2018 . (ag) (Entered: 11/27/2018) |
2018-12-07 | 38 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 Order, 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 35 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division. (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 12/07/2018) |
2018-12-07 | 39 | ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's Reply is due to the Court on or before December 21, 2018 . Defendant's Reply is due to the Court on or before January 11, 2019 . (ag) (Entered: 12/07/2018) |
2018-12-21 | 40 | REPLY in Opposition re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 Order, 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 35 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Eddie Beagles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA appeal, # 2 Exhibit FOIA appeal continued) (Dotson, David) Modified text on 12/26/2018 (jn). (Entered: 12/21/2018) |
2019-01-16 | 41 | NOTICE by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division of Entry of Administrative Order Staying Case (Attachments: # 1 Order) (Hoses, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2019) |
2019-01-30 | 42 | NOTICE by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division of Entry of Order Lifting Stay (Attachments: # 1 Order) (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-03-05 | 43 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross Motion for Summary Judgment Doc No. 35 filed by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division. (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 03/05/2019) |
2019-03-05 | 44 | NOTICE of Briefing Complete by U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eddie Beagles (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 03/05/2019) |
2019-03-07 | 45 | MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 35 Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. (tah) (Entered: 03/07/2019) |
2019-03-07 | 46 | FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah) (Entered: 03/07/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |