Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePINSON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00486
Date Filed2018-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJEREMY PINSON
Case DescriptionJeremy Pinson, Michael Stone, and Larry Bohl, all federal prisoners, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the CIA for records on themselves. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Pinson, Stone and Bohl filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantCIA
DefendantCIA
TERMINATED: 06/22/2018
DefendantOFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
DefendantUNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE
DefendantJOHN DIGNAM
DefendantCHARLES SAMUELS
DefendantMARK INCH
DefendantKARA LUNDY
DefendantCHARLES STOBLE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantLAMINE NDIAYE
AppealD.C. Circuit 18-5331
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [26]
Opinion/Order [46]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-211COMPLAINT against CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-02-212NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 12-cv-01872-RC. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-02-213ORDER of USCA that the motion for leave to file an addendum to the petition be granted and that the motions to appoint counsel be denied. USCA Case Number 17-05039. FURTHER ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus be granted as toPinson, the only petitioner remaining in the case. The district court is directed to file the complaint (which is attached to the petition for writ of mandamus) as to Pinson. See ln re Williams, No. 10-5122 (D.C. Cir. Jan. 4, 2012). The request for apportionment of fees is moot because Pinson is the only remaining petitioner. At this time, the court takes no position on the merits of the complaint. Because this court has granted Pinson's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis based on the Prison Litigation Reform Act's imminent danger exception, 28 U.S.C. § 1915(9), the district court shall allow Pinson to proceed in forma pauperis in the newly filed case.(zrdj) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-074SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/19/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/19/2018. (jf) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-038RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/12/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2018. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-046NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-047MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-04MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint by May 11, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/04/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/11/2018, (tj) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-05-119MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement by CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-2110FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by June 20, 2018 to 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/21/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2911MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-0712Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Field Decl., # 2 Declaration Stroble Decl.)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-1113MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-1414MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on or before July 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/14/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/5/2018 (tj) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-2215RESPONSE re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be filed" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/2018. (tth) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2216AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES SAMUELS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, CHARLES STOBLE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, LAMINE NDIAYE filed by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be filed" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/2018. (tth) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-0517Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Strobel Decl.)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-0918MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, CIA, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STOBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by August 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/10/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/13/2018. (tj) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1619REPLY to opposition re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-08-0820MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by September 13, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of the filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/08/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the amended complaint due by 9/13/2018, (hs) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-2721MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-1022MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by October 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/10/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/31/2018, (tj) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-1423Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-2424MOTION for Service Upon Newly Added Defendants by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-2925ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/29/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-2926MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/29/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-3127MOTION for Briefing Schedule , MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-1328NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 26 Memorandum & Opinion, 25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,, by JEREMY PINSON. Fee Status: No fee paid; IFP Motion Pending. Parties have been notified. (ztd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1329MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by JEREMY PINSON; (See docket entry no. 28 to view.) (ztd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1530Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis has been filed. Another transmission will be forwarded when the motion has been decided re 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,. (ztd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1531ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis . See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/15/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1632ORDER granting 27 Defendants' motion for a briefing schedule and for an extension of time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/16/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-1933Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 31 Minute Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ; (ztd) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-19USCA Case Number 18-5331 for 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by JEREMY PINSON. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-1934MOTION for Order to Show Cause by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/31/2019, Motions due by 1/30/2019. (tj) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-3035Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-1036MOTION for Order to Show Cause by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-2137Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-2838MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint , MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule Modification by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian); Modified text on 1/29/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2839MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit) (tth) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-2840MOTION for Subpoenas and Leave to Serve via Clerk or USMS by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit) (tth) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the current briefing schedule is amended to provide that Defendants shall file a dispositive motion by March 29, 2019 for the following Defendants, whose obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be stayed pending further order of the Court: (1) the Department of Justice, Office of Inspector General, (2)the Federal Bureau of Investigation, (3) the United States Marshals Service, (4) the Executive Office for United States Attorneys, and (5) the Central Intelligence Agency. This Motion shall also address any constitutional, Administrative Procedure Act, or tort claims that Plaintiff attempts to bring in her First Amended Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the date by which Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for the United States Bureau of Prisons and the Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy is extended to March 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/29/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-1141Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Subpoenas and Leave to Serve via Clerk or USMS filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-1942MOTION for Service Upon Individual Defendants by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-2643ORDER denying 24 , 42 Motions for service. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/26/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/28/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-1847MOTION for Order by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-1944MOTION for Extension of Time of the Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jf). (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-2045ORDER denying 34 , 36 motions for order to show cause; denying 39 motion to appoint counsel; denying 40 motion for the issuance of subpoenas. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/20/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-2046MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 34 , 36 motions for order to show cause; denying 39 motion to appoint counsel; denying 40 motion for the issuance of subpoenas. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/20/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-04-0148RESPONSE re 44 MOTION for Extension of Time of the Briefing Schedule filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar