Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
Order sealing 1 Complaint and 2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis should not be denied. Response due by October 9, 2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 17, 2018. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-05
5
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2018. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-11
6
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re denial of 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Objections due by October 25, 2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 11, 2018. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Complaint, # 2 Redacted Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)(jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11
7
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/11/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-12
8
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/12/18. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. No later than November 30, 2018, plaintiff shall pay the $400 filing fee. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-02
10
Mail sent to Juan Carlos Diaz returned as undeliverable re 5 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-07
11
Mail sent to Juan Carlos Diaz returned as undeliverable re 8 Order Reassigning Case, 7 Order Reassigning Case, 9 Order. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 6, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (mllS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-06
13
JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/6/18. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018) (Entered: 12/06/2018)