Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. U.S. Department of State
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv06163
Date Filed2018-10-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffLance Williams
Case DescriptionThe Center for Investigative Reporting submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning letters from Rep. Ed Royce to the agency pertaining to Gabon. CIR submitted another FOIA request for records pertaining to investments of Elliot Broidy, a Republican fundraiser, in Gabon. CIR also requested inclusion in the news media fee category and expedited processing. The agency granted CIR's request for inclusion in the news media category but denied its request for expedited processing. CIR filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-081COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of State (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12743688.). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/8/2018) Modified on 10/9/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-082Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/8/2018) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-083Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/8/2018) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-084Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/22/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-095CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Lance Williams.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-096Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-097Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-168CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/16/2018) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-11-149CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of State.. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-1510Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Department of State. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-12-2011ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 12/20/2018) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2012ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/20/2018) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-3013STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE filed by U.S. Department of State. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 12/30/2018) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
2019-01-0414Order, signed as modified on 1/4/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 13 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates. Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-02-1415CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by U.S. Department of State. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 2/14/2019) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-1516ORDER GRANTING re 15 Case Management Statement/ Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of State Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/15/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-03-1917CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND STIPULATION TO FURTHER CONTINUE CMC filed by U.S. Department of State. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 3/19/2019) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-2018ORDER GRANTING re 17 Case Management Statement filed by U.S. Department of State Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/20/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar