Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02336
Date Filed2018-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionWestern Values Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning Secretary Ryan Zinke's compliance with his ethical obligations, including travel expenses. American Oversight also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications between the agency and governmental entities in Puerto Rico. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from agency as to any of the requests, Western Values Project and American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5729755) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT, AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOI, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT, WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-11Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-11-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 10/22/2018; (See docket entry no. 4 to view.) (ztd) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-156NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-157ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-15MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ordered that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/15/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/5/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-068Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 joint status report, the parties shall file an updated joint status report on or before January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/7/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-049MOTION to Stay in Light of lapse in Appropriations by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the case shall be stayed pending renewed government funding. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/4/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-2810NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the restoration of appropriations, the stay in this case is lifted. The parties shall provide a joint status report on or before February 8, 2019, which shall include a proposed schedule for future proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/1/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-0811Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 the parties' joint status report, the parties shall provide an updated joint status report on or before March 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/8/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-03-2112Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' most recent joint status report, the parties shall file an updated joint status report on or before April 22, 2019. Given the apparently protracted production schedule, the parties shall file an updated status report every 60 days, beginning with the April 22 status report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/22/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/22/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-2213Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar