Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02370
Date Filed2018-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning its Religious Liberty Task Force. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Buzzfeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5737885) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - FOIA Response, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-152NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-16Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-11-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/29/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/2/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/2/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-12-037NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-038ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-049NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/4/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/18/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-1810Joint STATUS REPORT PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR DISCLOSURE by BUZZFEED INC.. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant file a motion for an Open America stay by January 28, 2019; Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion, if any, by February 11, 2019; Defendant shall file any reply in support of the motion by February 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 18-cv-2370. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/28/2019. Responses due by 2/11/2019. Replies due by 2/19/2018. (lsj) Modified on 12/26/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2019-01-2811MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Open America Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-30MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its motion for an Open America stay by March 29, 2019; Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion, if any, by April 12, 2019; Defendant shall file any reply in support of the motion by April 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/30/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/29/2019. Responses due by 4/12/2019. Replies due by 4/19/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-2812NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BUZZFEED INC.. Attorney Matthew Lynn Schafer terminated. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-2513LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-2914MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-1215Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 Defendant's Motion to Stay and 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, the Court hereby GRANTS 14 Defendant's Motion to Stay. The case is hereby stayed through November 26, 2019. During the pendency of the stay, Defendant shall issue an interim response by May 28, 2019 and a second and final response by July 12, 2019, pertaining to Attorney General Sessions' emails. Defendant shall also process and produce to Plaintiff as soon as is practicable, and no later than thirty (30) days, the email that Defendant located as described in 15 the parties' Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/16/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar