Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02373
Date Filed2018-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning Executive Order 13,457. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and various components provided records. The Office of Information Policy located 143 pages. It disclosed 32 pages entirely and 11 pages with redactions labeled "non-responsive. OIP also withheld 71 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). COA filed an administrative appeal arguing that OIP had improperly separated portions of documents into separate records. OIP denied COA's appeal. COA then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Agency Record

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-151COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5738133) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons AG, # 13 Summons DOJ, # 14 Summons US Atty)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Valvo, Russel)Modified on 10/17/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-153NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Mulvey on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-17Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-174SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-185ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/23/2018) (znmw). Modified on 10/23/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-186NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/23/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-23NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 5 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and refiled by counsel as Docket Entry ] 6 Notice of Appearance. (znmw) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-257NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2018. (Steven, Lee) Modified on 10/26/2018 to correct served date (jf). (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-259RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/22/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/21/2018. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-2510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/22/2018 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-2111Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-21MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must file a responsive pleading by November 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/21/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-2812ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-2913ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before January 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/29/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-1814NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Marie Cutri-Kohart on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-1815PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-19MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' proposed briefing schedule 15 , it is ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment must be filed by February 4, 2019; plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition must be filed by February 25, 2019; defendant's opposition and reply must be filed by March 11, 2019; and plaintiff's reply must be filed March 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/19/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2019-01-1416Unopposed MOTION to Stay all proceedings by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-14MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay. The parties must notify the Court within two business days of the resumption of government operations and propose a revised schedule for summary judgment, if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/14/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-2917NOTICE of Restoration of Appropriations and Proposed Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint notice 17 , the Court's January 14, 2019 minute order granting a stay in this case is hereby lifted. It is ORDERED that defendant must file its motion for summary judgment by April 5, 2019. Plaintiff must file its opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment by April 26, 2019. Defendant must file its opposition and reply by May 10, 2019, and plaintiff must file its reply by May 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/30/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-3018NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Damon William Taaffe terminated. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-04-0519MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Vanessa Brinkmann)(Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar