Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCalista Corporation v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictDistrict of Alaska
CityAnchorage
Case Number3:2018cv00246
Date Filed2018-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJohn W. Sedwick
PlaintiffCalista Corporation
Case DescriptionThe Calista Corporation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning grants given by the agency to the Association of Village Counsel Presidents. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (ongoing investigation or proceeding). Calista filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Calista filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-161COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC001508), filed by Calista Corporation.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-162Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-163Corporate Disclosure Statement by Calista Corporation. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-164CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Calista Corporation re 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and 1 Complaint. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-195Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (BJK, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-19Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(BJK, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-086AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney for District of Alaska, and U.S. Attorney General on 10/23/2018, filed by Calista Corporation. (Foster, Laura) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-237ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Pomeroy, Richard) (Entered: 11/23/2018)
2018-11-308INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-289First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report Unopposed by Calista Corporation.(Williams, Christine) Modified on 12/31/2018 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-0210TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The motion for extension of time at docket 9 is granted as follows: The time for filing the parties scheduling report is extended thru January 14, 2019. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-0311NOTICE of Withdrawing Attorney by Calista Corporation (Williams, Christine) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-02-0412JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The parties have not complied with the order at docket 10. They shall do so or show cause why they cannot do so within 7 days. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-0413STIPULATION Recalculation of R26(f) Planning Meeting Report Deadline by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pomeroy, Richard) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-1114ORDER re 13 STIPULATION Recalculation of R26(f) Planning Meeting Report Deadline . The report is due by 3/4/19. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/11/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-1415REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pomeroy, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-2116TEXT ORDER re 15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The parties' proposed schedule at docket 15 is approved. The parties shall comply with that schedule. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-04-1617MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Unopposed] by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pomeroy, Richard) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-1718ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's opening brief is due on or before May 16, 2019. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/17/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar