Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02410
Date Filed2018-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case DescriptionThe District of Columbia submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's detention of 12 D.C. residents in July 2018 and policies related to immigration enforcement actions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the District of Columbia filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Rock, Jimmy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/23/2018) (jf). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-242SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-11-263RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 10/30/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/31/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/30/2018.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rock, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-304NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-11-305ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 1/8/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/30/18. (DJS) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2019. (tb) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2019-01-046MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER: Denying 6 Without Prejudice Motion to Stay for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c), which requires that "[e]ach motion... shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/7/19. (DJS) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-077MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations) by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-088STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rock, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay 7 . Defendants' counsel shall notify the court within seven days after Congress has appropriated funds for the Justice Department. It is further ordered that all current deadlines for the parties shall be extended commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/19. (DJS) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-299NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-26MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 10 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report 3/12/19. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/26/19. (DJS) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2019. (tb) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-1211Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-14MINUTE ORDER LIFTING STAY: Effective 1/25/19. The parties shall file another joint status report by April 26, 2019. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/14/19. (DJS) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar