Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02415
Date Filed2018-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records containing video, audio, or photographs related to migrants and migrant children, and others seeking asylum. Leopold also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency denied his request for expedited processing but granted him a conditional fee waiver. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement told Leopold that it was unable to edit video footage. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-221COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5751963) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-222NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-243SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-244STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-11-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION served on 11/7/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 11/6/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/7/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 11/19/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-289RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/8/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-2810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/8/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/8/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-1011ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on January 4, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/11/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-12Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2019, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) Modified on 12/17/2018 to correct date (year)(kt). (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-2612NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-2813Unopposed MOTION to Continue the January 4, 2019, Scheduling Conference by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina). (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion to continue the January 4, 2019 Initial Status Conference and to stay the case, Dkt. 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The January 4, 2019 ISC is hereby VACATED and this case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed date for an initial status conference as soon as Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/30/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
2018-12-31Case STAYED. (kt) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-02-0614Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-06MINUTE ORDER: Given that funding has been restored for the Department of Justice, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case is lifted. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on March 6, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/6/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-03-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 3/6/2019. Oral motion by Defendant to file an Amended Answer; GRANTED, for the reasons stated on the record. Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-2015Amended ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-2516LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar