Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02419
Date Filed2018-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the General Services Administration, OMB, the FBI, and the Department of Justice for records concerning three meetings discussing the FBI Headquarters Consolidation Project. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-231COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5753671) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjd) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-253SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-294ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/29/18. (DM) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-11-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/25/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/31/2018; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 10/31/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/31/2018; U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 10/30/2018 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-166NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of All Defendants (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-167Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-16Minute Order: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 7 Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint is currently due November 26, 2018. Defendants' counsel was only recently assigned to the matter and requires additional time to consult with Defendants and prepare a response. Plaintiff does not oppose this motion. Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint is due DECEMBER 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/16/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/10/2018. (dot) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-078ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-109ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/10/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-0710MOTION to Stay by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-07Minute Order: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 10 Motion for Stay of the Deadline for Parties to Submit a Joint Status Report. The parties' Joint Status Report is due January 18, 2019. Defendants move to extend this deadline. As of December 21, 2018, the appropriations act that had been funding the Department of Justice expired and appropriations to the Department lapsed. Absent an appropriation, the Department is prohibited from working except in circumstances which do not apply to this case. Defendants request a stay until after appropriations have been restored and an extension of the deadline for the submission of the Joint Status Report commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Defendants report that Plaintiff takes no position with respect to tolling deadlines but opposes a general stay. As Defendants cannot work on this case during the lapse in appropriations, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion and ORDERS the case STAYED. Defendants are ORDERED to file a Status Report within seven days of the restoration of appropriations notifying the Court and the Plaintiff and requesting an appropriate deadline for submitting the Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01-07-2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-02-0111STATUS REPORT by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Minute Order: On January 7, 2019, this Court issued a stay in this case due to the lack of appropriations to the Department of Justice. As appropriations have now been restored, the Court ORDERS the stay lifted. The Court further ORDERS that the parties file their Joint Status Report by FEBRUARY 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2-1-2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2019. (dot) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-15Minute Order: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report. The parties report that GSA has conducted searches for responsive records and located them for only one of Plaintiff's three FOIA requests. GSA also reports that it is withholding the records in full as exempt from FOIA. The parties further report that OMB has initiated a search for records responsive to Plaintiff's three FOIA requests and expects to soon have estimates for the numbers of potentially responsive records. DOJ-OIP has initiated its search for records responsive to Plaintiff's two FOIA requests and estimates that it will complete its search by June 15, 2019. DOJ-FBI reports that it has also commenced its search for records responsive to Plaintiff's two FOIA request but cannot yet estimate the number of records or the time it will take to complete the search. The parties are ORDERED to file a further JOINT STATUS REPORT on MARCH 15, 2019. The parties are further ORDERED to file additional Joint Status Reports every 30 days thereafter. The parties are also free to file Joint Status Reports between the filing deadlines if issues arise that require the Court's attention. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2-15-2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2019. (dot) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-1513Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-04-1514Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar