Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02422
Date Filed2018-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI. The first FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and the White House concerning the FBI Headquarters Consolidation Project. The second FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and the White House concerning Trump International Hotel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further pertaining to either request, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-231COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5753804) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/25/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/31/2018 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-165NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-166Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-26MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer shall be due December 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/26/2018. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/26/2018 (lcapm3, ). (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer due by 12/10/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-077ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-108ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 28, 2018. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/10/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-189NOTICE of Appearance by Hart W. Wood on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-1810Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-19MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The Joint Status Report described in ECF No. 8 shall be filed on or before 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/19/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-0211MOTION to Stay by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for a Stay of Proceedings. This matter is hereby stayed. Within three business days of Department of Justice operations resuming, Defendant shall notify the court by when it will file a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/7/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-3012NOTICE to the court of restoration of appropriations by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-30MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report by February 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/30/2019 (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-0713Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report no later than February 20, 2019, which addresses the issues identified in paragraph 4 of their previous Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/12/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-2114Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-2215RESPONSE re 14 Status Report filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-2516RESPONSE re 16 to Plaintiff's Statement filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit plaintiff's statement)(Wechsler, Peter) Modified to add link on 2/25/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-2517RESPONSE re 16 Response to Document filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Decl. of Cerissa Cafasso, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Second Decl.)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-04MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a status hearing on March 11, 2019, at 9:00 am in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/4/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-0818STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-08MINUTE ORDER. The status conference currently set for Monday, March 11, 2019 at 9 a.m. will now be held Friday, March 15, 2019 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/8/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-08Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd) (Entered: 03/10/2019)
2019-03-1419NOTICE of Publicly Available FBI Correspondence by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 3/15/2019. Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/19/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-1920Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-22MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 28, 2019, which advises the court whether they have reached an agreement as to the scope of the searches at issue. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/22/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-2821Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-29MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 30, 2019, which updates the court on the agency's search and proposed time for completing production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/29/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar