Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02424
Date Filed2018-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to OMB. The first FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and the White House concerning the FBI Headquarters Consolidation Project. The second FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and the White House concerning Trump International Hotel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further pertaining to either request, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-231COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5753933) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zjd) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/25/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 10/31/2018 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-165NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-166Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time, which is unopposed, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before December 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-077ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before January 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 11, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-268MOTION to Stay by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 8 Motion for Stay of the Deadline for the Parties to Submit a Joint Status Report in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this case is STAYED until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall promptly notify the Court as soon as appropriations are restored, and at that time the parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 27, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-27Case Stayed. (jl) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-289NOTICE of restoration of appropriations by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 5, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-0511NOTICE of Appearance by Hart W. Wood on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-2112Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-2213RESPONSE re 12 Status Report filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-2514RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Statement filed by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit plaintiff's statement)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-2515RESPONSE re 14 Response to Document filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of Cerissa Cafasso, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Decl.)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the parties' recent filings, it appears that the parties did not confer about their proposed schedules for further proceedings. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule on or before March 15, 2019. If the parties remain unable to agree on a schedule, the Court will impose one. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 4, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-1516PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-18MINUTE ORDER adopting the schedule in the parties' 16 Joint Proposed Schedule. The defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before May 20, 2019; the plaintiff shall file its opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before June 21, 2019; the defendant shall file any reply and cross-opposition on or before July 12, 2019; and the plaintiff shall file any reply on or before July 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 18, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar