Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleANHAM FZCO v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02773
Date Filed2018-11-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffANHAM FZCO
Case DescriptionANHAM FZCO, a business in Dubai, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration Customs Enforcement for records concerning the Office of Professional Responsibility's investigation of former ICE Special Agent John Brusseau pertaining to allegations that he tried to obtain confidential information about ANHAM FZCO's financial director. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ANHAM FZCO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5810358) filed by ANHAM FZCO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANHAM FZCO (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-28Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-034NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/29/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/29/2018. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-216ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by January 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/4/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-317Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by March 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/1/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-158NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-03-159Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by April 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/18/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-04-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by May 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/15/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar