Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBALES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02779
Date Filed2018-11-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffROBERT BALES
Case DescriptionRobert Bales submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning seven Afghan men who were called to the United States to testify at Bales' court-martial. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Bales filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-281COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5811801) filed by ROBERT BALES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Summons Atty General, # 4 Summons Dept of State, # 5 Summons U.S. Atty.)(Maher, John) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-28Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-292SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-103NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-264MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 24, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 27, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/24/2019. (gdf) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-245Unopposed MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-24MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice. Defendant's response to the complaint, previously due on January 24, 2019, is now due within 30 days of appropriations being restored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 24, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-02-256ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report, including a proposed briefing schedule by March 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 25, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/12/2019; Status Report due by 3/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-127Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by April 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 12, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/15/2019 (tj) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-158Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by May 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 15, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/6/2019. (tj) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar