Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02784
Date Filed2018-11-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning the agency's influence campaign to support the nomination of Gina Haspel by declassifying select documents for the Senate and Haspel's potential conflict of interest in serving as the declassification authority for records about her actions. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the ACLU's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5813380) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Ladin, Dror) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Ladin, Dror) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-29Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-034ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/3/18. (DM) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2019-01-045ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/10/2018 (Ladin, Dror) Modified on 1/8/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-046ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/10/2018. (Ladin, Dror) Modified on 1/8/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-047ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/9/2019. (Ladin, Dror) Modified on 1/8/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-048Unopposed MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant Central Intelligence Agency's 8 Unopposed Motion for a Stay and Extension of Time in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Plaintiffs do not oppose this relief. Accordingly, in an exercise of the Court's discretion, the Court shall GRANT Defendant's 8 Unopposed Motion. The Court shall STAY the deadline for Defendant's answer or other response to the Complaint. The deadline is tolled commensurate with the length of the lapse of appropriations to the U.S. Department of Justice. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within seven calendar days of the restoration of the Department's funding and the resumption of its operations. This Joint Status Report shall include what the parties understand to be the new deadline for Defendant's answer or other response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 7, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-079NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-08NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entries 7 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, 6 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, 5 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant were entered in error and counsel is instructed to refile said documents with proof of delivery. (znmw) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-1010RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY on 12/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Ladin, Dror) Modified on 1/24/2019 (jf). (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1011RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Ladin, Dror) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1012RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Ladin, Dror) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-02-0613Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 13 Joint Status Report. The parties identify the restoration of government funding. Accordingly, the Court hereby LIFTS the stay in this matter. The Report indicates that an "internal misrouting issue" prevented defense counsel from "effectively confer[ring]" with Defendant agency prior to this filing. Accordingly, defense counsel requests further time to file a Joint Status Report. Although Plaintiff evidently consents, the Court is not inclined to permit further time to elapse before Defendant answers or otherwise responds to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint, which is the appropriate next step in these proceedings. Accordingly, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by MARCH 4, 2019 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 6, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-03-0414ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Westmoreland, Rachael) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-0515ORDER. The parties shall file the schedule not later than APRIL 4, 2019 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 5, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall file a schedule by 4/4/2019. (dot) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-2116NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Rachael Westmoreland (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-0417Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendant continues to search for responsive records but expects to complete its review and production on or before OCTOBER 15, 2019 . The parties propose filing a Joint Status Report within twenty-one days of that single production. Accordingly, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before NOVEMBER 5, 2019 , identifying any issues that remain in dispute and proposing a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 8, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2019, identifying any issues that remain in dispute and proposing a briefing schedule, if necessary. (dot) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar