Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleN'JAI v. BERRYHILL et al
DistrictWestern District of Pennsylvania
CityPittsburgh
Case Number2:2018cv01616
Date Filed2018-12-04
Date Closed2019-02-15
JudgeJudge Nora Barry Fischer
PlaintiffJACQUELYN N'JAI
DefendantNANCY A. BERRYHILL Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
DefendantNANCY A. BERRYHILL Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
TERMINATED: 01/04/2019
DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, MONROEVILLE OFFICE
DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, MONROEVILLE OFFICE
TERMINATED: 01/04/2019
DefendantMRS. SIMONS, SIMMS, OR JANE DOE SSA Representative at the Monroeville Social Security Office (in her personal and professional capacities)
DefendantMRS. SIMONS, SIMMS, OR JANE DOE SSA Representative at the Monroeville Social Security Office (in her personal and professional capacities)
TERMINATED: 01/04/2019
DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
DefendantUS SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (FTCA ONLY)
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [2]
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Opinion/Order [5]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-041MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JACQUELYN N'JAI. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP motion, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Envelope) (ept) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-202ORDER indicating that upon consideration of the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by pro se Plaintiff Jaquelyn B. N'Jai, (Docket No. 1 ), and the accompanying Complaint, said Motion 1 is GRANTED as to the In Forma Pauperis Status of pro se Plaintiff Jaquelyn B. N'Jai ONLY; the above captioned matter is dismissed, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; if Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint curing all of the deficiencies outlined herein by January 10, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/20/2018. (bdk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2019-01-043AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, US SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (FTCA ONLY), filed by JACQUELYN N'JAI. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 29B, # 32 Exhibit 29C, # 33 Exhibit 29D) (ept) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-044BRIEF in Support of 3 Amended Complaint filed by JACQUELYN N'JAI. (ept) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-02-155MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 3 is dismissed (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/15/2019. (bdk) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-156ORDER indicating that, in accordance with the foregoing Memorandum Opinion, Plaintiff Jacquelyn B. N'Jai's Amended Complaint 3 is DISMISSED; Plaintiff's FOIA and Privacy Act claims are dismissed, without prejudice, to reassertion after she has fully exhausted her administrative remedies but that the remaining claims in her Amended Complaint are dismissed, with prejudice; and, the Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/15/2019. (bdk) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar