Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00288
Date Filed2019-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the General Services Administration and the National Park Service for communications concerning the decision to reopen the Trump International Hotel, located in the Old Post Office Tower, a historic property overseen by NPS, during the shutdown, as well as communications with the Trump Organization. AO also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. NPS asked AO to justify its request for a fee waiver under the Interior Department's revised FOIA regulations. AO provided a detailed explanation. After hearing nothing further from either agency, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-051COMPLAINT against U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5927072) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-05Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-053SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-054MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th St. NW, B255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5929874. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-065STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/6/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Katherine M. Anthony's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 4 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Katherine M. Anthony may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/6/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/11/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 2/11/2019; U.S. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 2/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-03-077NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of All Defendants (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-078ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-089ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on April 10, 2019, at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report and a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d) on or before April 3, 2019. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/8/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/8/2019 to add correct order) (kt). (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-0810AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Redline Comparison to Original Complaint), # 2 Summons)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/3/2019. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019, at 12:30 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-03-1111SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically for Amended Complaint as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (ztd) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/12/2019) (ztd). (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-2812RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/12/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/18/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/18/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clay M. Goode)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-0313Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on May 3, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference set for April 10, 2019 is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for May 14, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/5/2019. (lcrdm3, ) Modified on 4/5/2019 to correct hearing type (kt). (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2019. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 5/14/2019, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) Modified on 4/5/2019 to correct hearing type (kt). (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-1114ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar