Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-02-13 | 1 | COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23204437 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Center For Biological Diversity. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Catherine W Kilduff added to party Center For Biological Diversity(pty:pla))(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | 2 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Center For Biological Diversity. (Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | 3 | NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Center For Biological Diversity, (Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-14 | 4 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (jtil) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-02-14 | 5 | 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association. (jtil) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 6 | PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Center For Biological Diversity, upon Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association served on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to by certified mail. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to by certified mail. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons, # 2 Exhibit Return receipts, # 3 Exhibit Civil Order)(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 7 | STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to National Oceanic Atmospheric Association answer now due 5/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association.(Attorney Jason K Axe added to party National Oceanic Atmospheric Association(pty:dft))(Axe, Jason) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-05-03 | 8 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 28, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Axe, Jason) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 9 | ORDER EXTENDING TIMETO RESPOND TOCOMPLAINT by Judge Manuel L. RealI. T IS SO ORDERED that Defendant shall have an extension of time, up to and including May 29, 2019, within which to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (yl) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-15 | 10 | Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Damon A Thayer counsel for Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association. Adding Damon A Thayer as counsel of record for National Oceanic Atmospheric Association for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Administration. (Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party National Oceanic Atmospheric Association(pty:dft))(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-15 | 11 | ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-15 | 12 | Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Damon A Thayer counsel for Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association. Jason K. Axe is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Administration. (Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 13 | ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association.(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-06-07 | 14 | STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association.(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-07 | 15 | STIPULATION for Order Extension of Plaintiff's Time to file Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Defendant National Oceanic Atmospheric Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-12 | 16 | MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Manuel L. Real: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii) filed 6/7/2019 14 , this action is hereby dismissed. All dates are hereby vacated and off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: None Present. (gk) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 17 | ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS 15 by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which to file a motion for attorneys fees and costs shall be extended by 30 days. (lom) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |