Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00418
Date Filed2019-02-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy for records concerning potentially fraudulent data generated by Tetra Tech pertaining to possible radiological contamination at the former Naval Air Station Treasure Island in San Francisco Bay. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told PEER that it would be unable to respond within 20 days. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-191COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5954669) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration 7.1 disclosure, # 3 Summons Navy Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons, # 5 Summons USAODC Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/19/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (zef, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-19Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-04-034NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-045ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/5/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 5/3/2019. (kh) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar