Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv00909
Date Filed2019-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffAura Bogado
Case DescriptionAura Bogado, a reporter for the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's contract with MVM, Inc., which has a contract to transport migrant children between U.S. Customs and Border Protection custody and Department of Health and Human Services custody. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-201COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13105925.). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Aura Bogado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Clopper, John) (Filed on 2/20/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-202Proposed Summons. (Clopper, John) (Filed on 2/20/2019) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-203MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-13106158.) filed by Aura Bogado, The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Clopper, John) (Filed on 2/20/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-204Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-215Order, signed 2/21/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John D. Clopper.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-256Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-257Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-268Certificate of Interested Entities by Aura Bogado, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Clopper, John) (Filed on 2/26/2019) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-269CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aura Bogado, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Clopper, John) (Filed on 2/26/2019) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-0610CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aura Bogado, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Clopper, John) (Filed on 3/6/2019) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-2211STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2212CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2513ORDER GRANTING re 11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/25/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-04-0514CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/5/2019) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar