Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00435
Date Filed2019-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications between the Office of Civil Rights and a number of outside groups, OCR appointment calendars, and a third request just covering communications and appointment calendars for OCR employee Justin Butterfield. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the three requests, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5957806) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to HHS)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-03-254NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-255ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 25, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-266AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-287Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-28MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that on or before April 24, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint status report containing a proposed schedule for the processing and production of records. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 28, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/24/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-098ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar