Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00459
Date Filed2019-02-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State, the Department of Treasury, the Department of Homeland Security, and the Small Business Administration for records concerning communications between agency officials and Fox News and a number of other conservative media organizations. DFF also requested a fee waiver. All the agencies except the State Department acknowledged receipt of the request. The Treasury Department told DFF that its request was too broad to search. DFF sent a letter to Treasury claiming its request was sufficiently specific. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5963410) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-253SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/30/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/28/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/6/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/27/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 2/27/2019; UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION served on 2/26/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-075NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re U.S. Small Business Administration (Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/30/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/28/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/26/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-04-017NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-018ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by April 16, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/2/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/16/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-099MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-10MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by May 16, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/10/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-1010RESPONSE re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/16/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar