Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEQUITY FORWARD v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00461
Date Filed2019-02-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffEQUITY FORWARD
Case DescriptionEquity Forward submitted six FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications between the agency and a number of conservative organizations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the first four requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Equity Forward filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5964585) filed by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to HHS)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUITY FORWARD (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-254STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/25/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-255ERRATA by EQUITY FORWARD 1 Complaint, filed by EQUITY FORWARD. (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/28/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/04/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/1/2019 (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-287NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-288ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-29MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before April 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/29/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar