Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00463
Date Filed2019-02-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffRICHARD MCLEOD
PlaintiffNICKY HAGER
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project, investigative reporter Nicky Hager, and New Zealand attorney Richard McLeod submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the Department of State, the Department of Justice, and the Department of Defense for records concerning Operation Burnham, a 2010 military operation conducted in Afghanistan. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The CIA told JMP that its request should be sent to DOD instead. JMP filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The FBI told JMP that it found no records. JMP filed an administrative appeal of the FBI's no records response. However, after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, JMP, Hager, and McLeod filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-251COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5964820) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NICKY HAGER, RICHARD MCLEOD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons CIA, # 4 Summons DoD, # 5 Summons DOJ, # 6 Summons State, # 7 Summons USADC, # 8 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-253SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/4/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/4/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/04/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/4/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-04-048NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-049ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-04MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/4/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar