Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStatton v. Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2019cv00485
Date Filed2019-02-25
Date Closed2019-04-22
JudgeJudge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
PlaintiffJoshua Statton
Case DescriptionJoshua Statton, director of Florida for Transparency, submitted a FOIA request to the Florida Federal Judiciary Nominating Committee for records concerning the application of Judge Thomas Barber for a vacancy on the Middle District of Florida. Carlos Lopez-Cantera, chair of the committee, told Statton that the records were not subject to FOIA. After hearing nothing further from Lopez-Cantera, Statton filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFlorida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission
DefendantCarlos Lopez-Cantera
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-251COMPLAINT against Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission, Carlos Lopez-Cantera Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA055441 filed by Joshua Statton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-252SUMMONS issued as to Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission, Carlos Lopez-Cantera. (JCG) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-253MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically permission to e-file by Joshua Statton. (JCG) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-274ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff Joshua Statton's Motion for Permission to E-File (Doc. # 3 ) is GRANTED. Statton is directed to register for a CM/ECF account (login and password) with the assistance of the Clerk's Office as detailed herein. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/27/2019. (DLB) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-055NOTICE by Joshua Statton re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Quo Warranto, # 2 Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Non-service)(Statton, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-066RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/6/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-297MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Cause of Action with Prejudice by Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission, Carlos Lopez-Cantera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Collins, Leonard) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-318RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Cause of Action with Prejudice filed by Joshua Statton. (Statton, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2019)
2019-04-019ORDER: Defendant Carlos Lopez-Cantera is directed to reply to Plaintiff Joshua Statton's response (Doc. # 8 ) by April 8, 2019, as provided herein. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/1/2019. (DLB) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-0510REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Cause of Action with Prejudice : Defendant Carlos Lopez Cantera's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Carlos Lopez-Cantera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Collins, Leonard) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0711MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply by Joshua Statton. (Statton, Joshua) (Entered: 04/07/2019)
2019-04-2212ORDER: Defendant Carlos Lopez-Cantera's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 7 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Joshua Statton's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Doc. # 11 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Statton's Complaint (Doc. # 1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/22/2019. (DLB) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar