Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00481
Date Filed2019-02-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for emails or text messages received by Deputy Attorney General Rod Rosenstein between May 8, 2017 and May 22, 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5967478) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-26Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/4/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/4/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-04-035ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-04MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/4/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-05-026Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-02MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by June 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/2/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-06-047Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/5/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-08-208Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar