Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00538
Date Filed2019-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning discussions of waivers or exceptions relating to the provision of nuclear energy to Saudi Arabia. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5972427) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-28Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/7/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 3/6/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-04-085NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-086ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-097ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 23, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/09/2019. (lcapm1) Modified on 4/9/2019 (lcapm1, ). Modified on 4/9/2019 (lcapm1). (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/9/2019) (zjd). (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-098Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-11MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 7, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/11/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar