Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00623
Date Filed2019-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning an incident in which AccuWeather, a private weather forecasting company, misinterpreted a test warning sent by the National Weather Service that a tsunami was approaching the East Coast. AccuWeather sent out an alert that the tsunami was real rather than a test. NOAA acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 34 pages and withheld two drafts. PEER filed an administrative appeal, arguing that NOAA's search was not adequate. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-061COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5984762) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration corporate disclosure, # 3 Summons Agency Summons, # 4 Summons DOJ Summons, # 5 Summons USAO Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/6/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-064ERRATA to first filing re LCvR 5.1(c)(1) by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY 1 Complaint, filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-225NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-156ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-15MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/15/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/29/2019 (tj) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar