Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00625
Date Filed2019-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Case DescriptionThe Campaign for Accountability submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning calendars and emails for Diane Foley, Deputy Assistant Secretary for Population Affairs. CfA submitted a third FOIA request for records concerning communications with Obria Medical Clinics. The agency did not acknowledge receipt of any of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, CfA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5984972) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-084MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alice C.C. Huling, :Firm- Campaign for Accountability, :Address- 660 Pennsylvania Avenue SE #337, Washington, DC 20003. Phone No. - (202) 780-5750. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5990013. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-085ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/8/19. (DM) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-08MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice with respect to Alice C.C. Huling, in order for her to appear as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/8/2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/11/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/11/2019 (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-197NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-04-058ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-099ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/9/2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 5/17/2019. (dot) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar