Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00652
Date Filed2019-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning communications between USDA officials and various industry groups or lobbyists representing them. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5987732) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Agriculture)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-07Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-073ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Modified on 3/8/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-08NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error. Only 1 summons was issued electronically and it was not correct. Three summons issued 03/08/2019. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-115STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/11/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/12/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 3/11/2019 (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-04-027NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-028Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-03MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/3/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 4/22/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-229ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar