Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-08 | 1 | MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Paul Reynolds. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Waiver of Service of Summons-Exhibit 4, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 03/08/2019) |
2019-03-08 | 2 | MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Mark Paul Reynolds. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 03/08/2019) |
2019-03-08 | 3 | ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey no longer assigned to case. Case number shall now ready 2:19-cv-4049-BCW. Copy mailed to plaintiff. Signed on 03/08/2019 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 03/08/2019) |
2019-04-12 | 4 | ORDERED Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #1) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #2) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order by U.S. Mail to: Mark Paul Reynolds, 9560 State Road O, Steedman, MO 65077-1310. Signed on 4/12/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella) Modified on 4/12/2019 copy of order mailed via regular mail to Mark Paul Reynolds, 9560 State Road O, Steedman, MO 65077-1310. (Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |
|