Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00672
Date Filed2019-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning a 1996 report by the CIA Inspector General pertaining to a drug-running, money-laundering operation involving the airport at Mena, Arkansas. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-111COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5992702) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Central Intelligence Agency)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 3/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-04-155NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-156ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-05-217Joint STATUS REPORT (1st) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar