Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00690
Date Filed2019-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning acting Secretary David Bernhardt, including his contacts with former clients, travel and security costs, and ethics compliance. AO also requested expedited processing after President Trump announced that he would nominate Bernhardt to replace former Secretary Ryan Zinke. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5995610) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Dept of the Interior)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-133STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/13/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-04-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/12/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/18/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/18/2019 (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-115ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-12MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on May 14, 2019, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/12/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-12Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (dot) Modified on 4/15/2019 to correct hearing type (kt). (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-05-14Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2019. Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar