Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00775
Date Filed2019-03-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy for records concerning the agency's relationship with Tetra Tech and the work conducted cleaning up toxic waste at Hunters Point Navy Yard located near San Francisco Bay. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency subsequently told PEER that it was making an online interim disclosure. However, PEER was unable to open the link cited in the Navy's letter. The Navy also told PEER that the rest of its request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing anything further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6011935) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Summons agency summons, # 3 Summons DOJ Summons, # 4 Summons USAO DC Summons, # 5 Declaration corporate disclosure)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/21/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-114NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-305ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/30/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-146Joint STATUS REPORT (Proposed Schedule) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar