Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6011954) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Office of the Director of National Intelligence, # 5 Summons Central Intelligence Agency)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 3/26/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Date of Service Upon CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY 3/26/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) Modified on 3/27/2019 to add service on the CIA (jth). (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brigham John Bowen on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Bowen, Brigham) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Bowen, Brigham) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of their production of documents to plaintiff, on or before May 27, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/29/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-05-14 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Payne Lee on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 8 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Bowen, Brigham) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report on July 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/28/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-07-22 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Bowen, Brigham) (Entered: 07/22/2019) |
2019-07-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby adopts the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment by September 10, 2019. Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion, supported by the same memorandum of points and authorities, will be due October 1, 2019. Defendants' reply, combined with their cross opposition, will be due October 15, 2019. Plaintiff's cross reply will be due October 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/23/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-09-06 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowen, Brigham) (Entered: 09/06/2019) |
2019-09-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby grants the government's 10 unopposed motion for an extension of time. The briefing schedule will proceed as follows: Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment by September 17, 2019. Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion, supported by the same memorandum of points and authorities, will be due October 8, 2019. Defendants' reply, combined with their cross opposition, will be due October 22, 2019. Plaintiff's cross reply will be due November 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/10/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/10/2019) |
2019-09-17 | 11 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of P. Gaviria, # 4 Exhibit - Exhibits to Gaviria Decl., # 5 Declaration of A. Shiner and Exhibits, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowen, Brigham) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 12 | Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (with response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric W. Lee (with Exhibits A-E), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 13 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric W. Lee (with Exhibits A-E), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-21 | 14 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Notice of Substitution of Counsel by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-10-22 | 15 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jonathan D. Kossak on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE Substituting for attorney Brigham J. Bowen (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-11-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their response by November 19, 2019, with plaintiff's reply due December 10, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/1/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-13 | 16 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/13/2019) |
2019-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due November 27, 2019, with plaintiff's reply due December 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/14/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2019-11-22 | 17 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/22/2019) |
2019-11-26 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' opposition / reply shall be due December 11, 2019, with plaintiff's reply due December 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/26/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-12-11 | 18 | RESPONSE re 13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts) filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Statement of Facts (Amended) and Responses to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Kossak, Jonathan) Modified on 12/16/2019 to correct docket text (jf). (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-16 | 19 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Statement of Facts (Amended) and Responses to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/16/2019) |
2019-12-16 | 20 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2019) |
2019-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff must file its reply by January 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/17/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/17/2019) |
2020-01-15 | 21 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |