Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00785
Date Filed2019-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration for records concerning why the agency did not perform a review under the Endangered Species Act pertaining to its proposed revisions of the Safer Affordable Fuel-Efficient Vehicles Rule. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided a final response to CBD in which said it had considered the ESA in its environmental impact statement but that it was withholding all drafts of the report under Exemption 5 (privileges). CBD filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. CBD then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-211COMPLAINT against NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6012647) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate Rule LCvR 7.1, # 3 Summons NHTSA, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Su, Anchun) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/21/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-212MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maya Golden-Krasner,: Firm- Center for Biological Diversity,: Address- 660 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1000, Los Angeles, CA, 90017. Phone No. - (213) 785-5402. Motion for Admission of Maya Golden-Krasner to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6012649. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maya Golden-Krasner in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Su, Anchun) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-213LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-214SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-26MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Admission of Maya Golden-Krasner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 26, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-05-105NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-106ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-15MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to meet, confer, and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The joint status report shall be filed on or before June 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 15, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 6/12/2019. (hs) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar