Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6014163) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-11 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 04/11/2019) |
2019-05-01 | 6 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-05-02 | 7 | RESPONSE re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 3, 2019. Any future request for an extension by any party must be filed two business days before the date to be extended, and the parties must give themselves sufficient time to comply with LCvR 7(m). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/2/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-06-04 | 9 | ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before July 2, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/4/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff due by 7/2/2019. (tg) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-25 | 10 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of T. Allen, # 4 Exhibit Attachment A to Allen Decl., # 5 Exhibit Attachment B to Allen Decl., # 6 Exhibit Attachment C to Allen Decl., # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/25/2019) |
2019-07-03 | 11 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 07/03/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |