Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6014633) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-02 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-04-29 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Michelle Kopplin on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-05-01 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-05-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure on or before May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/01/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/15/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-14 | 7 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-05-15 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure on or before May 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/15/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-17 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-05-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/20/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/20/2019) |
2019-05-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/28/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-06-28 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/01/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/19/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-07-19 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/19/2019) |
2019-07-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before August 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/23/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/23/2019) |
2019-07-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/29/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-08-29 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/29/2019) |
2019-09-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 the parties' joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 27, 2019. The next status report shall update the Court regarding both the additional search of the Special Counsel's Office records and the FBI's first production of responsive documents. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/03/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/03/2019) |
2019-09-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-09-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-11-26 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before July 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/6/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/06/2019) |
2019-12-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/7/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 12/06/2019) |
2020-07-07 | 13 | Joint PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) Modified text on 7/8/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 07/07/2020) |
2020-07-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before October 7, 2020. The next report should include concrete statistics that will enable the Court to assess the progress of production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/08/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/08/2020) |
2020-07-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/7/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 07/09/2020) |
2020-10-07 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/07/2020) |
2020-10-08 | | STATUS REPORT ORDER: In light of the 14 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before 1/5/2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/08/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2021-01-05 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-01-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before May 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/05/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-05-04 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-05-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before June 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/05/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/05/2021) |
2021-06-07 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/07/2021) |
2021-06-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before July 8, 2021. If any disputes remain, the next Joint Status Report shall include a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/08/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-07-06 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/06/2021) |
2021-07-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before August 27, 2021, if this case is not dismissed sooner. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/07/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/07/2021) |
2021-08-27 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-08-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before October 8, 2021, if this case is not dismissed sooner. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/30/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/30/2021) |
2021-10-08 | 20 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/08/2021) |
2021-10-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 20 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/11/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/11/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |