Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00800
Date Filed2019-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning communications between agency officials, including its Miami office, and CNN pertaining to the arrest of Roger Stone. Judicial Watch also submitted a FOIA request to the Justice Department's Office of Special Counsel for records pertaining to communications between officials and CNN regarding the arrest of Roger Stone. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
TERMINATED: 04/02/2019
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
TERMINATED: 04/02/2019
AppealD.C. Circuit 19-5091
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6015747) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-284MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (ztd) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-02MINUTE ORDER: David Christenson's motion 4 to intervene is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/2/19. (DJS) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-046NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order on Motion to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments 1-4)(ztd) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-057Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 6 Notice of Appeal. (ztd) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-058LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson's motion for leave to memorandum concerning my 20-year exercise in futility, or maybe not This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/11/19. (ztd) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-09USCA Case Number 19-5091 for 6 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-119LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson's motion for leave to file a critical example of why I should prevail on behalf of you, your family, all American and Mankind This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/11/19. (ztd) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-3010ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-10MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 5/30/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/10/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/30/2019. (tb) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar