Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCASILLAS-PRIETO v. UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00765
Date Filed2019-03-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffALEJANDRO CASILLAS-PRIETO
Case DescriptionAlejandro Casillas-Prieto, a federal prisoner, submitted a number of FOIA requests to U.S. Marshals Service for records concerning his confinement in the Fannin County, Texas jail while in the custody of the Marshals Service. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Casillas-Prieto filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE
DefendantGEO GROUP, INC.
DefendantFANNIN COUNTY TEXAS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-061COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alejandro Casillas-Prieto. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Envelope)(ccol, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/20/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-062MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (AFFIDAVIT) by Alejandro Casillas-Prieto. (ccol, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/20/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-193MEMORANDUM ORDER (Transferring Action to the District Court of the District of Columbia). It is hereby ORDERED that this action is FILED solely for the administrative convenience of the Clerk. The action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 3/19/19. (Copy mailed to plaintiff).(jtho, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/20/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-19Case transferred to District of Columbia. Case file electronically sent to United Stated District Court District of Columbia. (jtho, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/20/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-204Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00148. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-04-225PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/16/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar