Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT filed by Milton Gooch, III. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100111238) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 2 | Summons Issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 3 | Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney General. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 4 | Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 5 | Return of Service Executed by Milton Gooch, III. (Attachments: # 1 Return of Service Attorney General, # 2 Return of Service DNI)(bnp) (Entered: 03/28/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 6 | STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/1/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-01 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re 6 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-05 | 7 | NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Milton Gooch, III (bnp) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-24 | 8 | ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Discovery ends on 9/23/2019.(Manship, Flora) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/24/2019) |
2019-04-24 | 9 | CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 6 Order, Certificate of Compliance with Standing Order by Flora Manship on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Manship, Flora) (Entered: 04/24/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 10 | Initial Disclosures by Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Manship, Flora) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 11 | Defendant's PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Manship, Flora) Modified on 5/24/2019 to edit text (bnp). (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 12 | Initial Disclosures filed by Milton Gooch, III.(aaq) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 13 | Plaintiff's PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Milton Gooch, III. (aaq) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-28 | 14 | ORDER re 11 , 13 Preliminary Report and Discovery Plans. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Notice with the Court WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF THIS ORDER: (1) identifying specifically what documents or additional information Plaintiff contends Defendant has improperly withheld from production under FOIA; and (2) explaining in detail the basis for Plaintiff's contention that Defendant acted in bad faith in conducting an inadequate search for records in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Plaintiff is further DIRECTED to provide supporting documentation in Plaintiff's possession that would substantiate Plaintiff's contention that additional documents exist responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/28/2019. (bnp) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re 14 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-12 | 15 | RESPONSE to 14 Order Regarding Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan filed by Milton Gooch, III. (bnp) (Entered: 07/15/2019) |
2019-08-28 | 16 | Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Darcy F. Coty replacing attorney Flora Manship. (Coty, Darcy) (Entered: 08/28/2019) |
2019-09-06 | 17 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Seek Legal Counsel by Milton Gooch, III. (bnp) (Entered: 09/09/2019) |
2019-09-10 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by Trishanda L. Treadwell on behalf of Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Treadwell, Trishanda) (Entered: 09/10/2019) |
2019-09-12 | 19 | ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Seek Legal Counsel which the Court construes as a Motion to Stay all Deadlines. The Court STAYS all deadlines in the case for a period of 45 days from the date of this Order. In the event Plaintiff retains counsel, counsel should file a Notice of Appearance on the docket. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/12/19. (bnp) (Entered: 09/12/2019) |
2019-09-12 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re 19 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 09/12/2019) |
2019-11-01 | | Submission of 19 Order to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2020-01-03 | 20 | MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Milton Gooch, III. (bnp) (Entered: 01/06/2020) |
2020-01-17 | 21 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Treadwell, Trishanda) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-01-28 | 22 | MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Affidavit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Treadwell, Trishanda) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 01/28/2020) |
2020-01-31 | 23 | Clerk's Notice to Parties to Respond to 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment (bnp) (Entered: 01/31/2020) |
2020-01-31 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re 23 Clerk's Notice to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. (bnp) (Entered: 01/31/2020) |
2020-02-04 | | Submission of 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-02-04 | 24 | ORDER denying 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/4/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-02-04 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re 24 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-02-25 | | Submission of 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 02/25/2020) |
2020-02-26 | 25 | ORDER granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and CLOSE THE CASE. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/26/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 02/26/2020) |
2020-02-26 | 26 | CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant (bnp)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 02/26/2020) |
2020-02-26 | | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Milton Gooch, III re 25 Order and 26 Clerk's Judgment. (bnp) (Entered: 02/26/2020) |
2020-02-26 | | Civil Case Terminated. (bnp) (Entered: 02/26/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |