Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028033) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 03/28/2019) |
2019-03-28 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 03/28/2019) |
2019-03-29 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-03-29 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/8/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-15 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/12/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/8/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/08/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-04-16 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to agrogg@democracyforward.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The receipts need to be electronically filed in this case. In the future, file them with the return of service entry. (ztd, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019) |
2019-05-08 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-08 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-06-17 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/20/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-06-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2019. (kt) (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-07-17 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 07/17/2019) |
2019-07-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/17/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019) |
2019-07-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (kt) (Entered: 07/18/2019) |
2019-08-08 | 10 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Javier M. Guzman on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION Substituting for attorney Adam Grogg (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/08/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-09-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/17/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-09-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2019. (kt) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-10-15 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 10/15/2019) |
2019-10-16 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Paige Miller on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) the agency shall make its initial production on or before November 22, 2019, for which it shall process at least 500 potentially responsive pages, and (2) the agency shall thereafter make rolling productions occurring once every two months, for which the agency will process at least 1,000 potentially responsive pages. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/17/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2020. (dot) (Entered: 10/18/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 14 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. Attorney Javier M. Guzman terminated. (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-12-16 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2019) |
2020-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the terms of the Court's revised standing order, which is available on the Court's website. Click for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/22/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-01-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/23/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/23/2020) |
2020-02-17 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/17/2020) |
2020-02-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/18/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-04-17 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2020) |
2020-06-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before June 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/8/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 06/08/2020) |
2020-06-17 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 06/17/2020) |
2020-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 18 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/22/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 06/22/2020) |
2020-08-17 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2020) |
2020-08-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before October 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/18/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/18/2020) |
2020-10-19 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 10/19/2020) |
2020-10-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Parties' joint status report, Dkt. 20 , it is hereby ORDERED that Parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/19/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/19/2020) |
2020-12-17 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2020-12-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 21 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/19/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/19/2020) |
2021-02-17 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 02/17/2021) |
2021-02-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 22 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 02/17/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/17/2021) |
2021-04-16 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/16/2021) |
2021-04-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 23 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before June 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/17/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/17/2021) |
2021-06-16 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 06/16/2021) |
2021-06-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 24 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 06/17/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 06/17/2021) |
2021-08-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' failure to provide the Court with a joint status report on August 16, 2021, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall provide a joint status report on or before August 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/18/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/18/2021) |
2021-08-18 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 08/18/2021) |
2021-08-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 25 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/19/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/19/2021) |
2021-10-15 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 10/15/2021) |
2021-10-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 26 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/16/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/16/2021) |
2021-12-14 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2021) |
2021-12-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 27 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/15/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/15/2021) |
2022-02-15 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 02/15/2022) |
2022-02-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 28 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/15/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/15/2022) |
2022-04-08 | 29 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Christopher Hair (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 04/08/2022) |
2022-04-13 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 04/13/2022) |
2022-04-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 30 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/13/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/13/2022) |
2022-06-14 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 06/14/2022) |
2022-06-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 31 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/16/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 06/16/2022) |
2022-08-16 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 08/16/2022) |
2022-08-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 32 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/17/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/17/2022) |
2022-10-14 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 10/14/2022) |
2022-10-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 33 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 1, 2022, if they have not stipulated to dismissal prior to that date. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/17/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/17/2022) |
2022-10-24 | 34 | STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 10/24/2022) |
2022-10-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, Dkt. 34 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/24/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |