Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv01764
Date Filed2019-04-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffPatrick Michels
Case DescriptionPatrick Michaels, a reporter for the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services' Office of Refugee Resettlement for records concerning placements of unaccompanied children in non-government operated facilities. The second FOIA request asked for records pertaining to a facility in Arkansas. CIR requested a fee waiver for both requests. The agency did not acknowledge receipt of the first request but did acknowledge the receipt of the second request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-031COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13227726.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-032Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/3/2019) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-033Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/3/2019) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-034Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03Electronic filing error . Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting E-filer did no t select Patrick Michels for representation. Patrick Michels is not Pro Per. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-035Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/3/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-046Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-057CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patrick Michels, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/5/2019) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-088CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick Michels, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/8/2019) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-05-099STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 5/9/2019) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar