Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThompson v. U.S. Justice Department
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityNewport News
Case Number4:2019cv00033
Date Filed2019-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen
PlaintiffDavid M. Thompson
Case DescriptionDavid Thompson submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records. After the agency failed to respond to any of his requests, Thompson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Justice Department
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-041COMPLAINT against U.S. Justice Department ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 44683010053.), filed by David M. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt # 3 Proposed Summons) (epri, ). (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-052Two Summonses Issued as to U.S. Justice Department - via US Attorney and US Attorney General. Summons packages mailed to pro se plaintiff on 4.5.19. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-163CERTIFICATE of Service re 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued by Virginia Lynn Van Valkenburg on behalf of U.S. Justice Department (Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-05-134ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Justice Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Van Valkenburg, Virginia) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar