Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCANNING v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2011cv01295
Date Filed2011-07-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Gladys Kessler
PlaintiffGEORGE CANNING
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [44]
Opinion/Order [74]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-07-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616040830) filed by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
2011-07-19SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
2011-07-192NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GEORGE CANNING. Case related to Case No. 01-2215; 04-1464. (dr) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
2011-08-033NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
2011-08-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/28/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/27/2011. (rdj) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
2011-08-184Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
2011-08-19MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including September 26, 2011, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/19/11. (CL, ) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
2011-08-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 9/26/2011. (cdw) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
2011-09-236Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
2011-09-26ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time; Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint on or before October 6, 2011; Defendant shall have up to and including October 27, 2011, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/26/11. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
2011-09-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 10/6/2011. Answer due by 10/27/2011. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
2011-10-047NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by GEORGE CANNING (dr) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
2011-10-048AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by GEORGE CANNING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(dr) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
2011-10-279MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative , MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hardy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
2011-11-0110MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE CANNING (dr) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
2011-11-03MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 12, 2011, in which to file his response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Part or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/3/11. (CL, ) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
2011-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/12/2011 (CL, ) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
2011-11-2311MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE CANNING (dr) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
2011-11-29MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 16, 2011, in which to file his response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Part, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/29/11. (CL, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
2011-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/16/2011 (CL, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
2011-12-1412MOTION to Continue by GEORGE CANNING (dr) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2011-12-15MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue; Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Part, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment within two weeks of receiving the discovery he has sought from the Federal Bureau of Investigation. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/15/11. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2012-01-0513MOTION for Discovery by GEORGE CANNING (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George Canning, # 2 Interrogatories, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
2012-01-2314Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Discovery filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
2012-02-0215REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION for Discovery filed by GEORGE CANNING. (dr) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
2012-02-1416NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Peter Tavana on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney William Mark Nebeker (Tavana, John) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
2012-02-1417NOTICE OF MAILING by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 16 Substitution of Counsel (Tavana, John) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
2012-02-2118ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery is stayed; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Part or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment, shall remain stayed; the parties shall, by March 1, 2012, submit status reports regarding the processing of the underlying FOIA requests and the need, if any, for discovery at that point. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/21/12. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/1/2012 (CL, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-03-0119STATUS REPORT SUBMITTED BY BOTH PARTIES by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tavana, John) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
2012-03-0220ORDER that the Parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report, no later than April 16, 2012, advising the Court of their progress in resolving processing issues. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/2/2012. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
2012-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2012 (CL, ) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
2012-04-1621NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tavana, John) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
2012-04-1622MOTION to Stay Proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tavana, John) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
2012-04-1623STATUS REPORT (SECOND JOINT STATUS REPORT) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tavana, John) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
2012-04-16MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Stay; the docket sheet in this matter shall indicate that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in Part or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 9], has been withdraw; this matter shall be stayed for 90 days from the date of Defendant's Motion; no later than July 16, 2012, the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order for the submission of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/16/12. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
2012-04-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Scheduling Order for submission of dispositive motions is due by 7/16/2012 (CL, ) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
2012-04-2624NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by GEORGE CANNING (dr) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
2012-07-1225STATUS REPORT and JOINT SCHEDULING STATEMENT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tavana, John) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
2012-07-1326ORDER: The following are dates for filing dispositive motions: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment: 11/16/2012; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion: 12/17/2012; Defendant's Reply and Opposition: 1/7/2013; Plaintiff's Reply: 1/21/2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/13/12. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 12/17/2012. Response to Cross Motions due by 1/7/2013. Reply to Cross Motions due by 1/21/2013. Summary Judgment motions due by 11/16/2012. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/17/2012. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/7/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-11-0527NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sobia Haque on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney John Tavana (Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
2012-11-0928MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
2012-11-14MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on December 17, 2012; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion are due January 16, 2013; Defendant's Reply and Opposition are due February 6, 2013; and Plaintiff's Reply is due on February 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/14/12. (CL, ) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
2012-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 1/16/2013. Response to Cross Motions due by 2/6/2013. Reply to Cross Motions due by 2/20/2013. Summary Judgment motions due by 12/17/2012. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/16/2013. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/6/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
2012-12-1329Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
2012-12-14MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Defendant's Second Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including December 21, 2012, in which to file a Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion shall be due no later than January 21, 2013; Defendant's Reply and Opposition are due no later than February 11, 2013; and Plaintiff's Reply is due on February 25, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/13/12. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
2012-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 1/21/2013. Response to Cross Motions due by 2/11/2013. Reply to Cross Motions due by 2/25/2013. Summary Judgment motions due by 12/21/2012. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/21/2013. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/11/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
2012-12-2130MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Hardy (Second), # 4 Exhibit A-R, # 5 Exhibit S (part 1), # 6 Exhibit S (part 2), # 7 Exhibit T-Y, # 8 Declaration Hardy (Third), # 9 Exhibit A-I, # 10 Exhibit J-K, # 11 Declaration Walter, # 12 Declaration Suzuki, # 13 Declaration Dorris, # 14 Declaration Lutz, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
2013-01-1431Second MOTION for Discovery,and MOTION to Stay the case while discovery is conducted by GEORGE CANNING (dr) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
2013-01-1432MOTION to Stay the case until the Court rules on Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery by GEORGE CANNING (dr) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
2013-01-1433ENTERED IN ERROR.....Second MOTION for Interrogatories, and MOTION to Produce Documents and Recordings by GEORGE CANNING (dr) Modified on 1/28/2013 (dr). (Entered: 01/16/2013)
2013-01-1534NOTICE by GEORGE CANNING re 31 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Stay (dr) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
2013-01-2235Renewed MOTION for Discovery regarding his mailing of the July and December 2009 FOIA Requests, MOTION to Stay Case While Discovery is Conducted by GEORGE CANNING (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(td, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
2013-01-2536NOTICE of Consent to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Case Until the Court Rules on Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 32 MOTION to Stay (Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
2013-01-2537Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION for Interrogatories MOTION to Produce, 35 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Stay, 31 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
2013-01-28MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Case Until the Court rules on Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/28/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
2013-01-28MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including February 15, 2013, in which to file its Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Motion. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/28/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
2013-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/15/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
2013-01-28NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 33 MOTION for Interrogatories MOTION to Produce were entered in error at the request of chambers. (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
2013-02-1438MOTION for Protective Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
2013-03-0439MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 3/8/13 by GEORGE CANNING (td, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
2013-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 8, 2013, in which to file his Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/7/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
2013-03-1140Memorandum in opposition to re 38 MOTION for Protective Order filed by GEORGE CANNING. (td, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
2013-03-1541Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Protective Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
2013-03-18MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including April 1, 2013, in which to file a reply in support of its Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/18/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
2013-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 4/1/2013 (CL, ). (Entered: 03/18/2013)
2013-04-0142REPLY to opposition to motion re 38 MOTION for Protective Order filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
2013-04-0243ORDER denying 31 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery and for a Stay of the Case While Discovery is Conducted; denying 35 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Discovery; and granting 38 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order; discovery remains closed in this case; the Parties shall not engage in discovery until further Order of this Court; Plaintiff shall file his Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment no later than May 1, 2013; Defendant shall file a reply, if any, no later than June 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/2/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
2013-04-0244MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order on Plaintiff's Motions for Discovery and a Stay of the Case and Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/2/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
2013-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/1/2013. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/1/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
2013-05-0145Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE CANNING (td, ) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
2013-05-06MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall have up to and including May 8, 2013, in which to file his Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/6/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
2013-05-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/8/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
2013-05-0946Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by GEORGE CANNING (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(td, ) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
2013-05-0947Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING. (td, ) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
2013-05-2348Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
2013-05-28MINUTE ORDER granting 48 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including July 15, 2013, in which to file its Memorandum in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/27/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
2013-05-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 7/15/2013. Replies due by 7/15/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
2013-07-1249Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-23MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including August 15, 2013, in which to file its Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment and its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/22/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
2013-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motion due by 8/15/2013. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/15/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
2013-07-3150NOTICE of Change of Address by GEORGE CANNING (jf, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
2013-08-1551MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
2013-08-16MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including August 29, 2013, in which to file its Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/16/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
2013-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 8/29/2013. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/29/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
2013-08-2652Memorandum in opposition to re 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING. (td, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
2013-08-2853Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition to Cross-Motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
2013-08-29MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including September 27, 2013, in which to file its Reply Memorandum in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; no further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/29/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
2013-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 9/27/2013. Replies due by 9/27/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
2013-09-0454MOTION for Leave to File supplemental opposition by GEORGE CANNING (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opposition)(td, ) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
2013-09-0956ERRATA by GEORGE CANNING 54 MOTION for Leave to File filed by GEORGE CANNING. (td, ) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
2013-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/10/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
2013-09-1055SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING. (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
2013-09-1357NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kevin Michael Laden on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Sobia Haque (Laden, Kevin) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
2013-09-1358MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laden, Kevin) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
2013-09-16MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including October 28, 2013, in which to file its reply in further support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/16/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
2013-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 10/28/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
2013-09-1659Memorandum in Partial opposition to re 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING. (td, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
2013-10-1160NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
2013-10-1161Unopposed MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
2013-10-2162Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 61 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laden, Kevin) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
2013-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including November 18, 2013, in which to file its Reply Memorandum in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/21/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
2013-10-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 11/18/2013. Replies in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/18/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
2013-10-2463NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Mercedeh Momeni terminated. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
2013-11-1864Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Further Support of 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration)(Laden, Kevin) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
2013-12-0565REPLY to opposition to motion re 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE CANNING. (td, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
2014-01-0266MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Stay by GEORGE CANNING (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
2014-01-0267MOTION for Leave to SUBMIT A SUPPLEMENT TO HIS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by GEORGE CANNING (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
2014-01-0268MOTION FOR LIMITED IN CAMERA REVIEW by GEORGE CANNING (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
2014-01-1569Memorandum in opposition to re 68 MOTION FOR LIMITED IN CAMERA REVIEW, 66 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Stay, 67 MOTION for Leave to File filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Laden, Kevin) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
2014-03-1370NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Timothy E. Broomhead on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kevin Laden (Broomhead, Timothy) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-09-1271NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Laura Emily Jennings on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Timothy Broomhead (Jennings, Laura) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
2015-04-1072NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Laura Emily Jennings (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
2016-10-03MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby set in this case, and for case number 01-2215, for October 31, 2016, at 10:45 a.m.. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/3/16. (CL) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-03Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/31/2016 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-17MINUTE ORDER: The Status Conference now set for October 31, 2016, is hereby rescheduled for November 15, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/17/16. (CL) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-17Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/15/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-11-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 11/15/2016. (Court Reporter Lisa: Moreira) (tth) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-16MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 61 the Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/16/16. (CL) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2017-04-2573ORDER denying 66 Plaintiff's Third Motion Motion for Discovery and for a Stay of the Case While Discovery is Conducts; denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Submit a Supplement to His Reply in Support of Partial Summary Judgment; and denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Limited In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/25/17. (CL) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-2574MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order denying Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery, Plaintiff's Motion to Submit a Supplement to His Reply in Support of Partial Summary Judgment; and Plaintiff's Motion for Limited In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/25/17. (CL) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff